THE MGGS DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of students at Maidstone Grammar School for Girls,primarily, but not exclusively, by providing and assisting with provision of buildings and facilities at school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 17 May 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sharon Taylor | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jordan | Trustee | 07 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Sims | Trustee | 07 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kate Turnham | Trustee | 07 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lindsay Horne | Trustee | 24 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Stanley | Trustee | 30 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.77k | £14.84k | £90.35k | £37.42k | £59.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.83k | £6.77k | £27.25k | £26.89k | £25.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 07/04/2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF STUDENTS AT MAIDSTONE GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOR GIRLS PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING WITH PROVISION OF BUILDINGS AND FACILITIES AT THE SCHOOL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Maidstone Grammar School For Girls
Buckland Road
MAIDSTONE
Kent
ME16 0SF
- Phone:
- 01622 752103
- Email:
- central@mggs.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window