Financial history BISHOPSTON PLAY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1142286
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £8.17k £13.93k £1.90k £11.84k £10.52k
Total expenditure £14.17k £4.17k £3.52k £13.90k £15.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £3.90k N/A £8.00k £5.10k