Trustees BISHOPSTON PLAY ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1142286

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katherine Brigid Mattingly | Trustee | 05 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andora Wild Miss | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosie Greenaway | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Polly Amelia Bridget Crook | Trustee | 23 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
TERESA DE VALL | Trustee | 13 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH MONTAGUE | Trustee | 07 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
KATIE GREENAWAY | Trustee | 06 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
MIKE GREENAWAY | Trustee | 06 May 2011 |
|
|||||
SUE BRADSHAW | Trustee | 06 May 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.