Financial history REBGA ( READING EX BRITISH GURKHA ASSOCIATION)

Charity number: 1143839
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £3.08k £12 £6.43k £5.02k £3.77k
Total expenditure £5.38k £925 £3.50k £8.05k £4.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A