Accounts and annual returns RED ZEBRA COMMUNITY SOLUTIONS

Charity number: 1145674
Charity reporting is up to date (54 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 26 March 2025 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 26 March 2025 54 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 08 November 2024 282 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 08 November 2024 282 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 29 March 2023 57 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 29 March 2023 57 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 March 2022 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 28 March 2022 56 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 July 2021 163 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 13 July 2021 163 days late Download Open in new window