Financial history RED ZEBRA COMMUNITY SOLUTIONS

Charity number: 1145674
Charity reporting is up to date (54 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £795.56k £471.72k £356.03k £344.30k £295.48k
Total expenditure £964.11k £619.31k £370.86k £333.63k £295.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £161.28k
Income from government grants N/A £33.40k £311.34k £329.09k £121.08k
Income - Donations and legacies £780.26k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £13.81k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £1.48k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £905.83k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £47.55k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £226.17k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £58.29k N/A N/A N/A N/A