Financial history PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ABBEYDALE AND MILLHOUSES

Charity number: 1142485
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £183.03k £203.81k £276.95k £221.10k £221.11k
Total expenditure £220.99k £213.97k £445.23k £221.63k £295.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A