Financial history DISCOVER ISLAM LUTON

Charity Number: 1143363
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £95.74k £90.46k £33.25k £87.23k £69.20k
Total expenditure £66.32k £76.43k £71.56k £83.83k £67.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.54k £27.00k N/A N/A N/A