BURTON ALBION COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1142920
Charity reporting is up to date (60 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Sporting programmes within the community. Health & Wellbeing Programmes within the Community Employability Programmes within the Community Alternative Education Programmes within the Community Educational programmes within the Community

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Staffordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 July 2011: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
TERENCE GRAHAM CLARKE Trustee 21 June 2024
None on record
Frank Edgar Lewis Spiers Trustee 20 May 2021
None on record
Dr DEBORAH TAYLOR Trustee 17 February 2017
None on record
christopher wood Trustee 23 May 2016
ABBOTS BROMLEY SPORTS ASSOCIATION LIMITED
Received: On time
MR Phil Pusey Trustee 08 June 2015
RIVERSIDE CHURCH BURTON
Received: On time
BURTON RENEWAL FELLOWSHIP
Received: On time
HOPE IN BURUNDI
Received: On time
DAVID MICHAEL MELLOR Trustee 29 June 2011
None on record
CLARENCE BENNIE ROBINSON Trustee 29 June 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £1.70m £1.15m £1.37m £1.65m £1.55m
Total expenditure £1.69m £1.14m £1.24m £1.55m £1.87m
Income from government contracts £65.00k N/A £152.35k £290.63k £290.63k
Income from government grants £65.00k £118.15k £113.83k £2.96k £991
Income - Donations and legacies £105.51k £34.71k £16.84k £68.79k £171.74k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £368.95k £0 £6.34k £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.59m £633.16k £1.21m £0 £1.37m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £146.75k £1.57m £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.69m £44.51k £1.24m £1.55m £1.87m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £17.63k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £3.50k £3.57k £3.57k £7.17k £8.04k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £1.08m £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Own use assets £11.98k £11.63k £17.56k £47.13k £67.88k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £526.04k £645.14k £789.38k £938.63k £552.14k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £237.23k £345.49k £367.62k £452.94k £237.99k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 29 August 2024 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 29 August 2024 60 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 01 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022

(These accounts
have been qualified)

01 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 08 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021

(These accounts
have been qualified)

08 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 29 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 29 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 26 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

26 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Burton Albion Football Club
Pirelli Stadium
Princess Way
Burton-on-Trent
DE13 0AR
Phone:
01283565938
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available