Financial history Uncurbed Collective

Charity Number: 1143958
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £116.92k £219.66k £143.49k £91.81k £272.22k
Total expenditure £112.94k £116.36k £153.96k £132.69k £254.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A