DOVER STREET PASTORS INITIATIVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our missions is to provide aid to any body who needs it on a Friday and Saturday night in our town centre, by offering bottled water, flip flops, we will talk and listen to people, offer first aid when required. Our presence will generally calm people down avoiding any heated talking or fights.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- 19 January 2012: Standard registration
- DOVER STREET PASTORS (Working name)
- DOVER STREET PASTORS INIATIVE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nathan James FRIEND | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Jane CHEYNEY | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA RUTH WHEELER | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Carol Boxall | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Harris | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Green | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janet Jones | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.34k | £5.93k | £8.26k | £16.84k | £19.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.02k | £7.78k | £4.28k | £9.94k | £12.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.92k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 APR 2011 as amended on 17 Jan 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES BY SUCH MEANS AS THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE MAY CONSIDER APPROPRIATE IN DOVER AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFILL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY. TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN DOVER AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LICENCE AGREEMENT EXECUTED WITH ASCENSION TRUST AND THE CORE VALUES AND MISSION STATEMENT APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN DOVER AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY MEANS OF CARING, LISTENING AND HELPING PEOPLE ON THE STREETS AND AT VARIOUS VENUES DAY AND NIGHT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dover Baptist Church
27-32 Maison Dieu Road
DOVER
CT16 1RF
- Phone:
- 01304827828
- Email:
- dover@streetpastors.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window