Financial history LOVE DEREHAM LTD

Charity number: 1142632
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £14.78k £22.00k £3.09k £22.28k £44.05k
Total expenditure £9.46k £6.04k £9.07k £23.06k £30.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £11.33k N/A £500 £18.50k