Financial history HOUSING PATHWAYS

Charity number: 1143249
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.28m £2.38m £2.52m £115.11k £2.51m
Total expenditure £2.05m £2.17m £2.09m £128.87k £2.51m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £12.00k £2.00k N/A £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £183.99k £181.66k N/A £210.11k
Income - Charitable activities £2.28m £1.79m £1.81m N/A £1.84m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment £156.08k £388.15k £449.42k N/A £454.29k
Income - Other £0 £400 £75.50k N/A £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.97m £1.95m £1.84m N/A £2.30m
Expenditure - Raising funds £20.83k £218.49k £251.91k N/A £209.62k
Expenditure - Governance £25.89k £47.15k £51.28k N/A £13.84k
Expenditure - Grants institution £97.25k £148.40k £78.55k N/A £146.08k
Expenditure - Investment management £20.83k £21.44k £22.01k N/A £20.02k
Expenditure - Other £58.28k £0 £0 N/A £0