SEDGEFIELD AREA AND SURROUNDING COMMUNITIES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Youth Work Adult Learning
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Total income includes £15,000 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Durham
- Hartlepool
- Sunderland
Governance
- 09 August 2011: Standard registration
- 18 January 2017: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 18 January 2017: Funds transferred to 1170497 SPENNYMOOR YOUTH AND COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
- SASC (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.26k | £41.26k | £10.06k | £26.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £113.53k | £74.63k | £7.82k | £22.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £15.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 02 December 2016 | 306 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 11 February 2015 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 21 November 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 21 November 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/04/2010
Charitable objects
PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF SEDGEFIELD AREA AND SURROUNDING COMMUNITIES IN THE NORTH EAST (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE AREA OF BENEFIT') WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATION TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; SASC PREMISES AND FACILITIES. MAINTAIN AND MANAGE ANY SASC PREMISES AND FACILITIES (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH THE LOCAL AUTHORITY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window