Accounts and annual returns EAST AFRICAN RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT

Charity number: 1144089
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 28 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2023 28 December 2024 366 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2022 28 December 2024 731 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 18 January 2022 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 08 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required