CARE FARMING UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Mission: To provide a voice and supportive services for care farming to inspire decision makers and to develop policies and actions that will support care farming in the UK. Aim: To promote, enable and support the development and growth of care farming provision throughout the UK Current Objectives: available on request
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 April 2012: Standard registration
- 06 December 2018: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 06 December 2018: Funds transferred to 294494 SOCIAL FARMS AND GARDENS
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73.90k | £13.09k | £51.79k | £45.18k | £62.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £73.91k | £15.04k | £26.97k | £42.18k | £54.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £11.62k | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 21 December 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 17 November 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 17 November 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 15 October 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 15 October 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 26 August 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 26 August 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/05/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09/03/2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO SUPPORT AND PROMOTE CARE FARMING (AS DEFINED BELOW) AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE METHODS AND BENEFITS OF CARE FARMING AND IN FARMING AND RELATED PRACTICES, EACH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. CARE FARMING, IN THESE ARTICLES, MEANS THE OPERATION AND USE OF FARMING AND RELATED PRACTICES FOR THERAPEUTIC, VOCATIONAL, EDUCATIONAL AND TRAINING PURPOSES, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE WITH HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE NEEDS; THOSE IN UNEMPLOYMENT; THOSE IN NEED OF REHABILITATION; YOUNG PEOPLE AND OTHERS IN CHARITABLE NEED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window