NORTH YORKSHIRE DALES METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity Number: 1143259
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We seek to: call people to Jesus Christ, to nurture them in the faith and help them live it out identify spiritual, material and physical needs and engage in such service provide pastoral care where brokenness can be healed and people discover their potential in Christ. We provide governance of the local Methodist schools as they promote personal, social, moral and spiritual education.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • North Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 August 2011: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

37 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Marion Young Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Janet Pringle Trustee 01 August 2020
None on record
Rachel Martin Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Joshua Huddleston Trustee 09 March 2022
None on record
Pauline Beckett Trustee 09 March 2022
None on record
Janet Leahy Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Rev Julia Reid Trustee 01 September 2020
THE COMMUNITY FOR SPIRITUAL FORMATION
Received: On time
Helen Hughes Trustee 01 August 2020
HUNTON AND ARRATHORNE VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
Kathleen Wood Trustee 01 August 2020
CHURCH ABOUT THE DALE
Received: On time
Marjorie Iveson Trustee 01 August 2020
None on record
Rev David Wood Trustee 01 August 2020
None on record
Wendy Grannan Trustee 01 August 2020
None on record
Rev Phil Clarke Trustee 01 August 2020
None on record
Michelle Stonley Trustee 01 August 2020
None on record
Mary Sowerby Trustee 01 August 2020
None on record
Tricia Kirby Trustee 01 August 2020
None on record
Barbara Robinson Trustee 01 September 2016
None on record
Jackie Mc Cartney Trustee 01 September 2016
None on record
Angela Mary Heywood Trustee 01 September 2016
None on record
Graham Di Duca Trustee 16 March 2015
None on record
HEATHER SOWERBY Trustee 01 September 2014
None on record
Jonathan Sparey Trustee 18 September 2013
None on record
Elizabeth Sparey Trustee 18 September 2013
None on record
MRS CHRISTINE LAMB Trustee 18 September 2013
None on record
Margaret Elizabeth Simpson Trustee 18 September 2013
None on record
MRS ANGIE BAILY Trustee 18 September 2013
DARLINGTON METHODIST DISTRICT
Received: On time
RUTH POULTNEY Trustee 10 April 2013
None on record
MRS LIZ HAYTHORNTHWAITE Trustee 01 September 2012
None on record
Rev JENNIFER EDMONDSON Trustee 11 April 2012
None on record
MRS BEV MACE Trustee 05 August 2011
None on record
KATHERINE BRIGHTMAN BA HONS Trustee 05 August 2011
None on record
ANN WIGHT Trustee 05 August 2011
None on record
JANET EILEEN HARKER Trustee 05 August 2011
None on record
JULIE PLEDGE Trustee 05 August 2011
None on record
EUNICE SPENCER PAGE Trustee 01 August 2011
None on record
TREVOR SMITH CQSW Trustee 01 August 2011
None on record
Rev KATHLEEN BOWE BED BA Trustee 01 August 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £119.08k £348.00k £251.28k £613.18k £613.18k
Total expenditure £131.11k £260.75k £308.23k £302.04k £302.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £0 £24.95k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £613.18k £588.23k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £302.04k £302.04k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Own use assets N/A N/A N/A £0 £1.66m
Long-term investments N/A N/A N/A £0 £5.74k
Other assets N/A N/A N/A £974.66k £618.92k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Total liabilities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 22 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 22 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 02 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 02 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 18 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 18 May 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2021 11 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 11 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 07 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 07 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Dove Cottage
Moor Road
Leyburn
DL8 5DH
Phone:
01969623818