THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF EAST BARNET

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Anglican Church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barnet
Governance
- 27 July 2011: Standard registration
- ST. MARY THE VIRGIN'S PCC, EAST BARNET (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr ALEC CORIO | Chair | 28 July 2019 |
|
|||||||
Dr Christopher John David Yates | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Alison Mary Blunt | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Christine Watson | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Gail Constance Phillips | Trustee | 18 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Stephen Edwards | Trustee | 27 April 2015 |
|
|||||||
John Savage | Trustee | 30 April 2014 |
|
|
||||||
JOHN HAWKINS | Trustee | 23 May 2012 |
|
|
||||||
Roger Melling | Trustee | 08 July 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £105.70k | £115.19k | £126.47k | £974.98k | £160.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £135.41k | £133.02k | £116.19k | £1.04m | £223.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £5.00k | N/A | £1.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £71.64k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £28.53k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £8.40k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.42k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £864.98k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.00k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £923.63k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £118.79k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 March 2025 | 144 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 December 2024 | 48 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 November 2023 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 November 2023 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02/01/1956
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
East Barnet Parish Office
2 Cat Hill
EN4 8JB
- Phone:
- 02084403231
- Website:
-
stmaryseastbarnet.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window