Financial history NORTH WALES SOCIETY FOR THE BLIND

Charity number: 1143368
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £335.88k £328.54k £238.98k £387.39k £274.89k
Total expenditure £435.88k £420.68k £529.82k £555.52k £458.16k
Income from government contracts £118.59k N/A £118.59k N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A