ROOT & BRANCH WESTMILL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Root & Branch was an unincorporated charity (1088493) until Aug 2011. Located on an organic farm it provides opportunities for people with mental health disorders to engage in gardening, woodworking, blacksmithing, crafts and other skills, to help them to recover confidence, meet new people, prepare for future employment and be able to engage more fully with the wider society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £36,860 from 1 government contract(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
21 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
- Oxfordshire
- Swindon
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 09 August 2011: Standard registration
- 28 June 2012: Funds received from 1088493 ROOT & BRANCH WESTMILL
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Gerard Taylor | Chair | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Louise Silk | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Jane Place | Trustee | 08 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martyn Boyd Cooper | Trustee | 08 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Neil Laurence Griffiths | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Rosemary Wheeler | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Colin David Bell | Trustee | 04 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Anthony Atkins | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas William Daisley | Trustee | 11 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Emma Welch | Trustee | 19 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £95.93k | £114.68k | £133.37k | £125.83k | £122.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £104.19k | £92.16k | £127.28k | £120.16k | £128.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £36.42k | N/A | £38.04k | £36.86k | |
|
Income from government grants | £31.37k | N/A | £34.11k | £38.04k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 February 2022 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 February 2022 | 23 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28/06/2011
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE MENTAL AND EMOTIONAL WELL-BEING OF PERSONS WHO ARE AFFECTED BY A RANGE OF HEALTH PROBLEMS INCLUDING MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS AND PHYSICAL DISABILITIES BY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION OF THERAPEUTIC HORTICULTURE AND CRAFT ACTIVITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Root & Branch
West Mill Farm
Watchfield
Swindon
SN6 8TH
- Phone:
- 01793782999
- Email:
- office@rootandbranch.org.uk
- Website:
-
rootandbranch.info
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window