DARUL QURAN NAZIR BAZAR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
DARUL QURAN NAZIR BAZAR DELIVERS A RANGE OF SERVICES DESIGNED TO IMPLEMENT THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS: 1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ALL OVER THE WORLD THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS AND SCHOLARSHIPS TO ENABLE THEM TO CONTINUE THEIR EDUCATION.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 November 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout London
- Bangladesh
Governance
- 08 December 2011: Standard registration
- DQNB (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MD MONIR AHMED | Chair | 13 August 2011 |
|
|||||
MOHAMMED ABDUL KADIR | Trustee | 13 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
ASRAF HUSSAINCHOUDHURY | Trustee | 13 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
MD NAZRUL ISLAM | Trustee | 13 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
MUHAMMAD MONIR ALI | Trustee | 13 August 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/11/2019 | 28/11/2020 | 28/11/2021 | 28/11/2022 | 28/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.91k | £7.24k | £1.31k | £5.16k | £1.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £300 | £7.67k | £847 | £6.01k | £1.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 November 2023 | 19 November 2024 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 November 2022 | 04 January 2024 | 98 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 November 2021 | 08 February 2023 | 133 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 November 2020 | 06 October 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 November 2019 | 13 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 20/07/2011
Charitable objects
1)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ALL OVER THE WORLD THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS AND SCHOLARSHIPS TO ENABLE THEM TO CONTINUE THEIR EDUCATION. 2)THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN THE LESS DEVELOPED COUNTRIES IN THE WORLD BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED. 3)THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG NEEDY PEOPLE ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD. 4)TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF LONDON AND THE NEIGHBORHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THEY SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANIZATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS. 5) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Fordham Street
LONDON
E1 1HS
- Phone:
- 07947324525
- Email:
- DQNBAZAR@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window