Financial history TIME OUT GROUP (STRATFORD-UPON-AVON) LTD

Charity Number: 1144226
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £11.98k £17.50k £15.46k £28.45k £33.45k
Total expenditure £15.99k £16.63k £20.47k £21.54k £22.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £3.00k N/A
Income from government grants £2.09k N/A N/A £1.75k N/A