Financial history Gateway Waterside

Charity number: 1143971
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £70.64k £51.53k £54.84k £59.34k £71.25k
Total expenditure £69.70k £59.95k £64.98k £68.01k £61.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A