Financial history THE INSTITUTE FOR OUTDOOR LEARNING

Charity number: 1149420
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £240.26k £226.33k £255.71k £262.93k £247.50k
Total expenditure £224.19k £184.74k £238.29k £284.40k £309.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A