Financial history HARINGEY JUNIOR ICE HOCKEY CLUB

Charity number: 1145848
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £80.60k £40.50k £137.42k £126.94k £137.51k
Total expenditure £76.78k £56.07k £122.51k £136.07k £138.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A