Financial history CLIFTON BETHESDA CHURCH LIMITED

Charity number: 1144722
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £117.72k £86.08k £82.61k £93.26k £126.86k
Total expenditure £117.70k £93.87k £84.90k £102.31k £103.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A