ST STEPHEN'S INDIAN ORTHODOX CHURCH, BIRMINGHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote Indian Orthodox Christian Faith. Conduct regular masses .Arrange activities for members.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
- India
Governance
- 04 January 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Mathew Abraham Palathinkal | Chair | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mithun Thomas | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
ABRAHAM KURIEN | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Annie Jacob Ruby | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Shibu Thomas | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Praveen Thomas | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Abraham Thomas | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Denin Thomas | Trustee | 12 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
BEJOY JOSEPH | Trustee | 05 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £86.60k | £57.22k | £80.57k | £116.61k | £156.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.65k | £33.69k | £61.15k | £58.27k | £94.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 SEP 2009 AS AMENDED ON 31/12/2011 as amended on 11 Feb 2024 as amended on 11 Feb 2024
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ORTHODOX CHRISTIAN FAITH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
427 Brays Road
Sheldon
Birmingham
B26 2RR
- Phone:
- 07882791150
- Email:
- ststephenioc@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window