Trustees ST STEPHEN'S INDIAN ORTHODOX CHURCH, BIRMINGHAM
Charity number: 1145271

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Mathew Abraham Palathinkal | Chair | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mithun Thomas | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
ABRAHAM KURIEN | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Annie Jacob Ruby | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Shibu Thomas | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Praveen Thomas | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Abraham Thomas | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Denin Thomas | Trustee | 12 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
BEJOY JOSEPH | Trustee | 05 April 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.