ROTARY CLUB OF BEDFORD PARK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Income is from fund-raising events either on our own or in conjunction with other charities/non-charities. Examples of the events are Speaker Dinners, Raft races on the River Ouse, Charity Golf Days and Cycle Challenges.We try to get to know a charity before providing funds by asking the charity to provide a speaker and tell about the charity. Mainly providing support for local 'organisations'
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Amateur Sport
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Bedford
- Buckinghamshire
- Cambridgeshire
- Hertfordshire
- Luton
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 22 September 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN ROBERT GILDER | Trustee | 30 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Michael O'Leary | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
PAUL THOMAS PATRICK NEANOR | Trustee | 01 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ALAN BRETHERTON | Trustee | 12 June 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.72k | £30.31k | £40.65k | £18.16k | £20.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.86k | £26.42k | £43.66k | £23.80k | £14.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 21 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 18 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 18 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 24 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17/03/2011
Charitable objects
UPON TRUST TO APPLY BOTH THE CAPITAL AND INCOME THEREOF TO OR FOR THE RELIEF OF THE POOR AND NEEDY OR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE CLUB SHALL IN DULY CONSTITUTED MEETING FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
212 Kimbolton Road
BEDFORD
MK41 8DP
- Phone:
- 01234266260
- Email:
- olearytm212@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
bedfordparkrotary.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window