BORO ANGELS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The focus of the charities activities remains maintaining a presence in Middlesbrough town centre, mainly on weekend evenings, to give practical help and support to those who need it.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Middlesbrough
Governance
- 28 November 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nigel Hughes | Chair | 29 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Cook | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Doak | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.67k | £509 | £2.77k | £3.05k | £3.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.08k | £0 | £4.26k | £4.73k | £3.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 May 2024 | 110 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 November 2021 | 283 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07 JUN 2011
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, CARING, LISTENING AND HELPING PEOPLE ON THE STREETS AND AT VARIOUS VENUES DAY AND NIGHT IN MIDDLESBROUGH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Linthorpe Road Resource Centre
Middlesbrough
TS1 2JR
- Phone:
- 07759 045329
- Email:
- admin@boroangels.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window