THE WEST BRIDGFORD OPERATIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 1147591
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Staging full-length musical and dramatic works and concerts of assorted musical and dramatic material.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £23,772
Total expenditure: £26,158

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Nottinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 June 2012: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • WBOS (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
William Robert Radford Trustee 17 July 2024
THE WEST BRIDGFORD OPERATIC SOCIETY
Recently registered
Sarah Angela Shields Trustee 19 July 2023
THE WEST BRIDGFORD OPERATIC SOCIETY
Recently registered
Wendy Janet Anne Silver Trustee 19 July 2023
THE WEST BRIDGFORD OPERATIC SOCIETY
Recently registered
Samantha Thorne Trustee 14 July 2021
THE WEST BRIDGFORD OPERATIC SOCIETY
Recently registered
Judith Atkin Trustee 17 July 2019
THE WEST BRIDGFORD OPERATIC SOCIETY
Recently registered
Helen Margaret Heeley Trustee 13 July 2016
THE WEST BRIDGFORD OPERATIC SOCIETY
Recently registered
MALCOLM CHARLES COCKING Trustee 17 July 2013
THE WEST BRIDGFORD OPERATIC SOCIETY
Recently registered
LEE HORNE Trustee 17 July 2013
PIERREPONT GAMSTON PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA
Received: On time
THE WEST BRIDGFORD OPERATIC SOCIETY
Recently registered
DAVID HEMINGTON Trustee 23 September 2011
THE WEST BRIDGFORD OPERATIC SOCIETY
Recently registered
JILL HEMINGTON Trustee 23 September 2011
THE WEST BRIDGFORD OPERATIC SOCIETY
Recently registered

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £22.00k £315 £24.81k £23.72k £23.77k
Total expenditure £20.44k £570 £24.42k £27.68k £26.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 31 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 06 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 07 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 25 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 17 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
68 MUSTERS ROAD
WEST BRIDGFORD
NOTTINGHAM
NG2 7PR
Phone:
07530126012