THE KISS FOUNDATION UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The KISS Foundation was set up with a vision of educating and empowering the poor marginalized section of society who do not even get a square meal a day. It will support Kalinga Institute of Social Sciences (KISS), Bhubaneswar, India, which provides 40,000 poor indigenous children with food,education,health facilities,sports FREE OF COST from Class 1 to postgraduation & professional courses.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- India
Governance
- 29 September 2011: Standard registration
- THE KISS FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DWITI VIKRAMADITYA | Trustee | 29 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr ACHYUTA NANDA SAMANTA | Trustee | 29 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
LINDA MARY HUNTER | Trustee | 28 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
PAUL BOWDEN LLB LLM | Trustee | 28 September 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 November 2024 | 302 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2022 | 302 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15/09/2011 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 11/03/2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST ARE THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN INDIA IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) BY: 1.2.1 PROVIDING GRANTS TO SUPPORT THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN INDIA, AND IN PARTICULAR TO SUPPORT EDUCATION AT THE KALINGA INSTITUTE OF SOCIAL SCIENCES ("KISS") AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL ORGANISATIONS IN INDIA; 1.2.2 PROVIDING GRANTS TO SUPPORT THE PROVISION OF HEALTHCARE, ACCOMMODATION AND TRAINING TO CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN NEED AT KISS AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN INDIA; AND 1.2.3 RAISING AWARENESS OF THE WORK CARRIED OUT BY KISS AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL AND WELFARE ORGANISATIONS IN INDIA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
N-6-145
JAYADEV VIHAR
PO-IRC VILLAGE
NAYAPALLI, BHUBANESWAR
751015, ORISSA, INDIA
- Phone:
- 00919937220249
- Email:
- DWITI.VIKRAMADITYA@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window