Financial history REVELATION AT THE SHED

Charity number: 1145753
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/07/2020 30/07/2021 30/07/2022 30/07/2023 30/07/2024
Total gross income £845 £5.67k £420 £420 £455
Total expenditure £911 £1.80k £240 £1.07k £1.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A