INSPIRE PLUS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting Young People be Healthier, Happier & more Active -Supporting High Quality PE & School Sport provision in schools -To ensure young people meet recommended physical activity levels -To commit to work with partners for the 'broader' wellbeing of young people -Engage & equip the next generation of leaders/volunteers -Sustainable High Quality provision regardless of government funding
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£1,080,455
Donations and legacies | £271.51k | |
Charitable activities | £791.24k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £17.70k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£997,961
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £997.96k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £261,448 from 2 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £997.96k | |
Retained for future use | £82.49k |
People

26 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
285 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Leicestershire
- Lincolnshire
- Norfolk
- North Lincolnshire
- Nottinghamshire
- Peterborough City
Governance
- 02 November 2011: Standard registration
- INSPIRE + (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carol Hines | Trustee | 24 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul David Alec Stokes | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Barnes | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rob Price | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Hart | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Bill Lord | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tom Mountain | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Darren Joint | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Bijal Ladva | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
RODNEY JOHN TYLER | Trustee | 02 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
SIMON JAMES BARTER BAHONSQTS | Trustee | 02 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS GAME | Trustee | 02 November 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £664.31k | £666.47k | £798.68k | £1.18m | £1.08m | |
|
Total expenditure | £527.90k | £548.10k | £560.25k | £811.68k | £997.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £256.14k | £261.45k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £32.49k | £12.31k | £9.74k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £24.00k | £12.00k | £28.03k | £7.31k | £271.51k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £639.36k | £620.81k | £757.00k | £1.17m | £791.24k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £952 | £1.16k | £1.36k | £653 | £17.70k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £32.49k | £12.31k | £6.73k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £527.90k | £548.10k | £560.25k | £811.68k | £997.96k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £17.21k | £32.78k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £0 | £14.43k | £13.09k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £510.11k | £643.93k | £906.38k | £1.31m | £1.44m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £33.59k | £49.04k | £73.06k | £116.42k | £170.30k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 05 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 05 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 15 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 15 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 10 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 10 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 14 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 14 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19 SEP 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25/10/2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, PARTICULARLY THROUGH SPORT AND PHYSICAL RECREATION, TO THE BENEFIT OF YOUNG PEOPLE AGED UNDER THE AGE OF 25 THROUGHOUT ENGLAND AND WALES, AND IN PARTICULAR IN THE COUNTY OF LINCOLNSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Inspire Plus
Kempton House
Dysart Road
GRANTHAM
Lincolnshire
NG31 7LE
- Phone:
- 01476 578137
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window