Financial history CHANGING TUNES

Charity number: 1144789
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £347.33k £498.81k £502.97k £627.47k £792.20k
Total expenditure £312.01k £418.70k £541.54k £561.88k £641.72k
Income from government contracts £10.00k £59.18k £173.23k £195.78k £288.00k
Income from government grants £5.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £327.22k £427.63k £464.95k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £858 £2.72k £2.00k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £174.89k £195.78k £319.84k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 £1.34k £5.41k
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £488.28k £502.69k £581.34k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £53.25k £59.19k £60.39k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £3.47k £3.64k £3.78k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0