Financial history THE KENNETH MONTAGUE DICKINSON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1144636
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 21/09/2020 21/09/2021 21/09/2022 21/09/2023 21/09/2024
Total gross income £12.67k £5.83k £7.67k £9.19k £14.28k
Total expenditure £15.44k £12.65k £13.89k £8.72k £12.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A