Financial history DURHAM STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1145400
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £2.63m £1.66m £2.39m £2.55m £2.64m
Total expenditure £2.56m £1.51m £2.45m £2.50m £2.66m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £149.17k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.52m £1.35m £1.25m £1.45m £1.56m
Income - Other trading activities £138.41k £9.07k £48.86k £0 £102.51k
Income - Charitable activities £210.08k £298.69k £1.10m £1.02m £959.44k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £12.38k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £81.86k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.26m £1.30m £2.29m £2.38m £2.49m
Expenditure - Raising funds £301.51k £216.66k £156.60k £124.56k £167.24k
Expenditure - Governance £5.11k £5.57k £8.09k £7.85k £9.98k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0