BONVILSTON READING ROOM

Charity number: 502415
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Local events of a social nature. Hire of the reading room for specific interests ie music, wood-working, photography.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £13,721
Total expenditure: £9,103

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Vale Of Glamorgan

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 May 1973: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROB THOMAS Chair 18 March 2019
None on record
Geoffrey Ernest Mitchell Trustee 17 March 2025
None on record
DARYL JONES MR Trustee 19 April 2024
None on record
ROSEMARY FISHER Trustee
None on record
PAUL STUART FISHER Trustee
None on record
CHRISTINE PATRICIA IMPEY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £7.14k £12.68k £4.83k £16.35k £13.72k
Total expenditure £16.69k £2.48k £2.67k £27.74k £9.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A £5.80k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 06 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 12 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 11 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 November 2021 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
43 VILLAGE FARM
BONVILSTON
CARDIFF
CF5 6TY
Phone:
07802467466
Email:
No information available
Website:

bonvilstonvillage.co.uk