Financial history WHITMORE REANS WELFARE CENTRE

Charity number: 1148072
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.61k £4.57k £10.00k £5 £1.15k
Total expenditure £5.76k £4.73k £5.71k £1.55k £877
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A