Accounts and annual returns DEVONPORT FIELD GUN ASSOCIATION LTD

Charity number: 1146971
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2016 11 July 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

11 July 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2015 29 July 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 29 July 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2014 07 August 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 07 August 2015 On Time