Financial history DEVONPORT FIELD GUN ASSOCIATION LTD

Charity number: 1146971
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016
Total gross income £14.23k £15.27k £57.57k £32.24k £29.92k
Total expenditure £11.37k £14.55k £55.97k £41.11k £39.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £12.90k £0