Financial history FRIENDS OF FLACKWELL HEATH LIBRARY

Charity number: 1146528
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £10.31k £6.52k £8.03k £9.34k £11.18k
Total expenditure £5.99k £2.31k £5.18k £44.05k £11.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.00k N/A N/A N/A £5.00k