Financial history THE WATERFALL TRUST

Charity Number: 1148491
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021
Total gross income £73.11k £50.63k £51.09k £32.99k £27.14k
Total expenditure £55.21k £69.65k £47.97k £36.54k £32.72k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £14.61k