Financial history THE NATIONAL LEAGUE TRUST

Charity number: 1145603
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £1.20m £1.20m £1.20m £1.22m £1.22m
Total expenditure £1.51m £509.58k £1.06m £1.24m £1.18m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.20m £1.20m £1.20m £0 £1.20m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.50k £133 £449 £7.42k £20.35k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £1.21m £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.51m £421.99k £1.06m £1.24m £1.04m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £15.41k £8.29k £6.88k £11.27k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £334.38k £951.28k £1.12m £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £87.59k £0 £0 £139.92k