Financial history PLAY ENGLAND

Charity number: 1150216
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.61k £2.78k £10.00k £11.12k £2.55k
Total expenditure £8.44k £4.10k £11.24k £14.00k £16.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A