Financial history RICHARD JEFFERIES MUSEUM TRUST

Charity number: 1148966
Charity reporting is up to date (91 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £79.58k £35.61k £38.85k £16.64k £40.50k
Total expenditure £71.52k £23.07k £28.03k £15.29k £35.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.50k £27.80k £21.07k £4.67k N/A