Financial history LLOYD'S REGISTER FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1145988
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £1.29bn £384.46m £996.51m £560.40m £572.06m
Total expenditure £1.33bn £360.50m £599.86m £550.11m £589.64m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.83m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £1.25bn £375.67m £569.10m £516.79m £546.62m
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £28.78m £8.79m £18.16m £25.24m £23.04m
Income - Other £8.13m £0 £409.26m £18.37m £2.40m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £19.68m £6.57m £18.54m £21.90m £23.90m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.56m £437.00k £865.00k £863.00k £855.00k
Expenditure - Governance £65.00k £59.00k £62.00k £65.00k £68.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £5.08m £1.32m £8.09m £11.17m £12.71m
Expenditure - Investment management £1.56m £437.00k £865.00k £863.00k £855.00k
Expenditure - Other £1.31bn £353.49m £580.46m £527.35m £564.89m