Financial history THE NEW MUSIC MAKERS

Charity number: 1146455
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £20.00k £9.56k £11.58k £17.63k £18.98k
Total expenditure £21.00k £9.61k £11.67k £19.49k £18.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A