Trustees THE NEW MUSIC MAKERS
Charity number: 1146455

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gen Marsh | Trustee | 16 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Anne Turl | Trustee | 28 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eunice Deuchar | Trustee | 28 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN PAY | Trustee | 30 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
JERRY GAMBLE | Trustee | 30 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
ERIC GERREY | Trustee | 19 February 2020 |
|
|||||
MARGARET BALLARD | Trustee | 17 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
SHARON MARY THOMAS | Trustee | 16 March 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.