COMMUNITY ASSETS PLUS

Charity number: 1148814
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

In Lincolnshire the charity manages assets of physical property for the benefit of community organisations, charities and social enterprises

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £570
Total expenditure: £709

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 September 2012: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • CA+ (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARTHA VAHL Chair 02 July 2012
None on record
Derrick Lowe Trustee 13 February 2024
None on record
Victoria Nadal Trustee 25 April 2023
None on record
SIMON ANDREW BEARDSLEY Trustee 02 July 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £65.13k £1.01k £591 £757 £570
Total expenditure £43.91k £26.88k £0 £0 £709
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 04 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 27 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 28 January 2024 212 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 26 April 2023 300 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 17 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 17 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Involve@Lincoln
12 Mint Lane
LINCOLN
LN1 1UD
Phone:
07804593533
Website:

No information available